Udovic, Lisa Ann (CPSO#: 90656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Lisa Ann (used until: 15 Oct 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Ave West,
Mississauga, Ontario
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mcmaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905 -527-0271
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Udovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Udovic ( CPSO# 90656 )

Business Address:
McMaster Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANN UDOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2011 to 15 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016