Udupa, Sharmila (CPSO#: 86494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Division of Cardiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 3257
Fax: 613-738-4835
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 08 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARMILA UDUPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDUPA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015