Uhlig, Eric Lawrence Paul (CPSO#: 54039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 418
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: (416) 929-1530
Fax: (416) 929-7398
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC LAWRENCE PAUL UHLIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UHLIG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1985