Uhthoff, Peter Andreas Fritz (CPSO#: 63560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
Department Of Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2420
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Public Health Agency of Canada
100 Colonnade Rd, Room 1018
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Uhthoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Uhthoff ( CPSO# 63560 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ANDREAS FRITZ UHTHOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UHTHOFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1991 to 14 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992