Ul Haq, Huma Zia (CPSO#: 89725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arkell Medical Centre
403 Arkell Road,Unit 4
Guelph ON  N1L 1E5
Phone: (519) 822-7831
Fax: 226-299-0503
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ul Haq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ul Haq ( CPSO# 89725 )

Business Address:
Arkell Medical Centre
403 Arkell Road
Unit 4
Guelph ON  N1L 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 822-7831

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMA ZIA UL HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UL HAQ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010