Ulrich, Emma Heydari (CPSO#: 105425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: Heydari, Emma (used until: 15 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Nephrology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA HEYDARI ULRICH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ULRICH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ULRICH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ULRICH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ULRICH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ULRICH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ULRICH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017