Umana, Ana Margarita (CPSO#: 63209)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De El Salvador, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1997