Umar Khitab, Allan Herbert (CPSO#: 61283)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Oct 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Oct 2001
Summary:

 On October 19, 2001 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Umar Khitab(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct with regard to disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional 
 conduct with regard to crossing boundaries of a sexual nature.

The Committee ordered the 
 following penalty:

1.	Dr. Umar Khitab be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on 
 the register;
2.	The Interim Registrar revoke Dr. Umar Khitab(s certificate of registration, the 
 said revocation is deemed to take place immediately; and,
3.	Dr. Umar Khitab pay to the College of 
 Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario ((the 	College() the costs of this hearing fixed in the sum of 
 $5,000 and that the costs be payable forthwith.

In addition, Dr. Umar Khitab has undertaken 
 to:

1.	Not apply to the CPSO, or any other licensing body in any jurisdiction, for a licence or 
 	certificate to practise medicine at any time;

2.	Immediately cease practising medicine or 
 psychotherapy, and resign any licence or 	certificate in any jurisdiction.

Additionaly, Dr. Umar 
 Khitab has consented that the information found in the undertaking be kept on the public 
 register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 15, 2001

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 2, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require, effective May 29, 2015, certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Allan Herbert UMAR-KHITAB:

(1) between March 1, 1994 and August 31, 1994, both dates inclusive at the City of Cambridge being in a position of trust or authority towards XX, a young person, did for a sexual purpose, touch directly the body of XX, a young person, with a part of his body, to wit: his hands, contrary to Section 153(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada,

(2) between March 1, 1994 and August 31, 1994, both dates inclusive, at the City of Cambridge, did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada,

(3) between January 1, 1991 and December 31, 1994, both dates inclusive, at the City of Cambridge, did for a sexual purpose touch YY, a person under the age of sixteen years, directly with his hand, contrary to Section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada, and

(4) between January 1, 1991 and December 31, 1994, both dates inclusive, at the City of Cambridge, did commit a sexual assault on YY, contrary to Section 371 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: March 25, 2013
Place of charges: Cambridge, ON
Waterloo Regional Police Service


Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 19, 2001
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Allan Herbert UMAR KHITAB (aka KHITAB) provided the following Undertaking to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (CPSO) on October 19, 2001, and consented to its entry
in the public register of the CPSO:

Dr. Allan Herbert Umar Khitab undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
that he will not apply to the College for reinstatement of his certificate of registration
or apply to any other licensing body in any jurisdiction for a licence or certificate of
registration to practise medicine at any time or under any circumstances.