Umoquit, Andres Bartolome (CPSO#: 52025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Southwestern University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13, Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 08 Apr 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 1, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Andres Bartolome
            Umoquit, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Umoquit to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Umoquit may only practice as a surgical assistant under the direction
                  of a surgeon and may not be the Most Responsible Physician for any
                  patient.