Underhill, Kelly Jane (CPSO#: 65433)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2003