Ung, Chantelle (CPSO#: 68337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Phone: (416) 750-8400
Fax: (416) 750-1091
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantelle Ung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ung ( CPSO# 68337 )

Business Address:
302 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 750-1066

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTELLE UNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999