Ung, Yee Chung (CPSO#: 61661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4951
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yee Ung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ung ( CPSO# 61661 )

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEE CHUNG UNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Mar 1993
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1993