Unger, Byron Paul (CPSO#: 68621)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996