Unger, Ivan Rodney (CPSO#: 25658)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 1706 190 Hespeler Road Cambridge ON N1R 8B8
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015