Unger, Sharon Louise (CPSO#: 67928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
19-231L - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8435
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heinrich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Unger ( CPSO# 67928 )
Dr. L. Heinrich ( CPSO# 71991 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Healthcare Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 985-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON LOUISE UNGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jun 1994 to 24 Jul 1994
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1999