Unger, Sheila Lorraine (CPSO#: 67016)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2006