Unger, Terry Lee (CPSO#: 83816)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.L. Unger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 18 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2008