Unger, Zoe Meredith (CPSO#: 91444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain
Management
399 Bathurst Street Room MCL 2-405
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Zoe Unger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Unger ( CPSO# 91444 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Room MCL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOE MEREDITH UNGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014