Ungrin, Shelley Louise (CPSO#: 79480)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Feb 2007 to 08 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012