Upadhye, Suneel (CPSO#: 70441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Emergency Medicine
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave.
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 38510
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 1C4
Canada
Phone: 905-540-1500
Fax: 905-540-1501
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Upadhye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Upadhye ( CPSO# 70441 )

Business Address:
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone Number: (905) 540-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 18, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Suneel Upadhye, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Upadhye has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") of
                                          DR. SUNEEL UPADHYE
                                          ("Dr. Upadhye") to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the
                  Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;

                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Upadhye, certificate of registration number 70441, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that the College received information from
                  the NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215633 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date I sign it (the "Effective Date").

            (5)   I, Dr. Upadhye, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N);
                        (vi)  Dr. Upadhye's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of eight (8) months on the terms set
                        out below (the "Clinical Supervision").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the
                        College.
                  
                  Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")
                  
                  (c)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of two (2) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every two (2) weeks to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review there are not 15 patients
                                    listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of all
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                              ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated
                                    a new prescription for:
                                    1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                    2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                    3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                          Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                                          where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic
                                          Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                                    or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                                    there are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log
                                    to whom I have initiated a new prescription for
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations or Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs where the patient is also
                                    prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                                    then the charts of all patients listed in the
                                    Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                                    review.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two (2) weeks.

                  (g)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that after a minimum of two (2) months
                        of Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have
                        the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced.
                  Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")
                  
                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review there are not 15 patients
                                    listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of all
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                              ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated
                                    a new prescription for:
                                          1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                          2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                          3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                                Targeted Substances and All other Monitored
                                                Drugs where the patient is also prescribed
                                                a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                                Preparation,
                                          or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                                          review there are not 10 patients listed in the
                                          Prescribing Log to whom I have initiated a new
                                          prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                          Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                                          and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                                          Monitored Drugs where the patient is also
                                          prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                          Preparation, then the charts of all patients
                                          listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                                          Supervisor's prior review.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                 (l)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6) months
                       of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have
                       the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without
                       supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the
                       College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                 
                 (m)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                       Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                       Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                 
                 (n)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                       Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                       understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). In
                       addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                       at a minimum:
                 
                             (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                                   Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as
                                   Schedule "F";
                 
                             (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews
                                   and observations;
                 
                             (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements
                                   and ongoing professional development and inquire into
                                   my compliance with the recommendations; and
                 
                             (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other
                                   documents or conducting interviews with staff or
                                   colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor(s) deem
                                   necessary to my Clinical Supervision.
                 
                 (o)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                       Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                       Location approved by the College;
                 
                 (p)   I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                       independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                       educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                       my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                       reports of the medical inspector dated March 26, 2017, May 12, 2017
                       and June 23, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                       Clinical Supervision.
                 
                 (q)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                       Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                       Undertaking and Schedule "E"
                       attached, and to abide by the reasonable recommendations of my
                       Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any
                       reasonable recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                       professional development.

                 (r)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                       Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                       (14) days of the Effective Date.
                 
                 (s)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake that if a person who has given an
                       undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                       unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                       fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                       undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                       is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                       College within that time.
                 
                 (t)   I, Dr. Upadhye, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                       Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (7)(r) and/or (s)
                       above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                       Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                       Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                       obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                 
                 (u)   I, Dr. Upadhye, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                       Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                       Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                       Monitored Drugs as a result of section (7)(t) above this will
                       constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                       registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                       included on the Public Register.
                 
           (8)   Professional Education

                 (a)   I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to participate in and successfully
                       complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                       Schedule "F", including but not limited to, the following elements
                       of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                 
                             (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in
                                   Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and
                                   in-person workshop):
                                   www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                 
                             (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                                   following resources:
                 
                              1.CPSO Policy "Prescribing
                              Drugs":http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
              
                              2.2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                              Non-Cancer Pain:
                              http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;

                              3.CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                              https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-
                              articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
              
                              4.the Centre for Effective Practice Management  of
                              Chronic Non-
                              Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp
              
                         (iii)Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              CPSO Policy "Medical
                              Records":http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                              Publications/Policy/Medical-Records; and
              
                         (iv) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
              
              
              
              (b)  I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                   successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                   specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                   participant assessment reports where available, within one (1) month
                   of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College will
                   determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                   completed each element of the Professional Education.
              
              (c)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                   to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                   Professional Education.
              
        (9)   Reassessment of Practice

              (a)  I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                   the Clinical Supervision set out under section 7 of the Undertaking
                   has ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                   assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").
              
              (b)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                   include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                   of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                   patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
              
              (c)  I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                   conducted under the terms of this Undertaking
              
              (d)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                   may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                   discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                   Reassessment.

              (e)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                   will be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                   Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
              
        (10)  Monitoring

              (a)  I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                   Location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                   limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                   jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                   (10) business days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
                   further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                   Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                   that Location.
              
              (b)  I, Dr. Upadhye, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                   interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                   and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                   monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
              
              
              
              (c)  I, Dr. Upadhye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                   appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"),
                   the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System
                   ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act,
                   2010 and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                   information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                   the provisions of this Undertaking.
              
              (d)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                   consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                   respectively.
              
        C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

        (11)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
              in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

        (12)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
              payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
              implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

        (13)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
              the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
              legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
              my right to do so.

        (14)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that the College will provide this
              Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
              responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

        (15)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
              Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
              incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
              the Discipline Committee of the College.

        (16)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
              terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
              the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

        (17)  Public Register

              (a)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                   Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                   the Public Register.
              
              (b)  I, Dr. Upadhye, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                   being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                   summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                   period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
              
                   The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring
                   System about Dr. Upadhye's prescribing of controlled substances,
                   including narcotics.
              
                   
              
              
              
                   Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                   investigation into whether Dr. Upadhye failed to maintain the
                   standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his
                   prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.  As a
                   result of the investigation:
              
              
                   *     Dr. Upadhye's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                         preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                         targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be
                         supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                         for minimum of eight (8) months.
              
                   *     Dr. Upadhye will engage in professional education in the
                         prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
              
                   *     Following the professional education and period of
                         supervision, Dr. Upadhye's prescribing of controlled
                         substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an
                         assessor selected by the College.

        D.    CONSENT

        (18)  I, Dr. Upadhye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
              following information to any person who requires this information for the
              purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
              to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

              (a)  any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                   entering into this Undertaking;
              
              (b)  any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                   of, my practice; and
              
              (c)  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                   this Undertaking.
              
        (19)  I, Dr. Upadhye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
              Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
              circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
              arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

        (20)  I, Dr. Upadhye, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
              my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
              Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
              and to one another, any information:

              (a)  relevant to this Undertaking;
              
              (b)  relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                   set out at Schedule "E";
              
              (c)  relevant to the Reassessment;
              
              
              
              
              (d)  relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                   Undertaking; and/or
              
              (e)  which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                   Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                   indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
              

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Suneel Upadhye to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 18, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Upadhye’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Upadhye failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Upadhye’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of eight (8) months.

Dr. Upadhye will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Upadhye’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective December 19, 2017.
Download Full Document (PDF)