Upfold, Jane Anne (CPSO#: 52026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
286 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2C8
Phone: (519) 851-7974
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ANNE UPFOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPFOLD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1984