Upham, John Warwick (CPSO#: 69831)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jan 1998