Uppal, Rakesh (CPSO#: 54659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
900 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Unit 5
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H7
Phone: (905) 452-0026
Fax: (905) 452-1974
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rakesh Uppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Uppal ( CPSO# 54659 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
900 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H7
Phone Number: (905) 452-0026

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH UPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPPAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986