Uppal, Vishal (CPSO#: 99708)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 01 Feb 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Feb 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2014