Upshur, Ross Edward Grant (CPSO#: 56997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 St. Matthews Avenue
Room a.234
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Ext. 2757
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS EDWARD GRANT UPSHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPSHUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987