Upton, Elwin Gilbert (CPSO#: 29897)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014