Upton, Julia Elizabeth Mainwaring (CPSO#: 77571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
7th Floor Elm Wing Room 7280
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8627
Fax: (416) 813-8638
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

202 St. Clair Avenue W
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Canada
Phone: 416-944-8333
Fax: 416-944-1582
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-360-4000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ELIZABETH MAINWARING UPTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2007