Urbach, David Robert (CPSO#: 66967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Room 8-8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7309
Fax: (416) 323-6173
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Urbach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Urbach ( CPSO# 66967 )
Dr. S. Urbach ( CPSO# 69254 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Room 8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT URBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBACH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998