Urbach, Stacey Lisa (CPSO#: 69254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: Varkul, Stacey Lisa (used until: 15 Apr 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7763
Fax: (416) 813-6304
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

302-2797 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M6B 4B9
Canada
Phone: 4167894376
Fax: 4167895321
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Urbach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Urbach ( CPSO# 66967 )
Dr. S. Urbach ( CPSO# 69254 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Room 8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY LISA URBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBACH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2000