Urbantke, Elizabeth Andrea (CPSO#: 71016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Dr.
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: (519) 421-4256
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Urbantke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Urbantke ( CPSO# 71016 )

Business Address:
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANDREA URBANTKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBANTKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Mar 1997 to 30 Mar 1997
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1997