Urfer, Francois-Nicolas (CPSO#: 64728)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Lausanne, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Societe Professionnelle de Medecine Francois Urfer

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2017