Urschel, John Douglas (CPSO#: 67511)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 405
St Davids ON  L0S 1P0
Phone: 7163452005
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 405 St Davids ON L0S 1P0
Date Received: 10 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018