Urton, Todd Elliott (CPSO#: 77525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Urton, Todd Elliot (used until: 17 Sep 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
190 Wellington Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3E4
Phone: (613) 507-3937
Fax: (613) 507-2597
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Todd Urton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Urton ( CPSO# 77525 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
190 Wellington Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3E4
Phone Number: (613) 507-3937

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD ELLIOTT URTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007