Uy, Isaac Nuqui (CPSO#: 25287)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003