Uy, Karl Fabian Lim (CPSO#: 78304)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manila Central University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006