Uys, Gerhardus Josuah (CPSO#: 81801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Echuca Regional Health
17 Francis Street
Victoria 3564 3564
Australia
Phone: 0456173494
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerhardus J. Uys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERHARDUS JOSUAH UYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UYS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2014