Vaccani, Jean-Philippe (CPSO#: 71100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Otolaryngology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2706
Fax: (613) 738-4122
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J-P Vaccani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vaccani ( CPSO# 71100 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Otolaryngology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-PHILIPPE VACCANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VACCANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003