Vadas, Peter (CPSO#: 52518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 8-161
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5777
Fax: (416) 864-3033
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Vadas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vadas ( CPSO# 52518 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 8-161
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5777

Business Address:
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 884-0666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 30 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER VADAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VADAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1984