Vadeboncoeur, Christina Marie (CPSO#: 64639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2679
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Roger's House
399 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Canada
Phone: (613) 523-6300
Fax: (613) 523-3617
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.M. Vadeboncoeur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Vadeboncoeur ( CPSO# 64639 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE VADEBONCOEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VADEBONCOEUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1991