Vagi Asztalos, Elizabeth Dorothy (CPSO#: 54372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M4-230
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87791
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Vagi Asztalos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Vagi Asztalos ( CPSO# 54372 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M4-230
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DOROTHY VAGI ASZTALOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAGI ASZTALOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985