Vahdat, Jamie Homayoun (CPSO#: 65139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Vahdat, Homayoun (used until: 14 Feb 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
7 - 165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 734-6716
Fax: (905) 734-7647
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

867 Upper Paradise Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 5R3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Homayoun Vahdat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vahdat ( CPSO# 65139 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
7 - 165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 734-6716

Business Address:
867 Upper Paradise Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 5R3
Phone Number: (905) 574-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE HOMAYOUN VAHDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAHDAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993