Vaidyanathan, Priya (CPSO#: 85392)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Madras, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 13 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007