Vaidyanathan, Sankar (CPSO#: 68738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Aug 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Tamil, Urdu

Education:University of Calcutta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 204
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Phone: (905) 792-6500
Fax: (905) 792-6853
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Village of Sandalwood Park
425 Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2W8
Canada
Phone: (905) 458-9272
Fax: (905) 458-1312
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Canada
Phone: (416) 244-8404
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4303 Village Centre Court
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 949-6999
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaidyanathan ( CPSO# 68738 )

Business Address:
Unit 204
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 792-6500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 15 Aug 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 08 Nov 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 10 Feb 2002
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Jan 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Jan 2008 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 5, 2008, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sankar Vaidyanathan
            in accordance with an Undertaking and Consent given to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario by Dr. Vaidyanathan:

                  I, Dr. Sankar Vaidyanathan, shall not engage in the following area(s) of
                  practice: surgical cosmetic procedures, including but not limited to
                  those specified in paragraph B of my undertaking, namely,(a) Thread Lifts
                  and (b) Any other surgical cosmetic procedure.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jul 2006
Summary:

On July 7, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vaidyanathan to have committed acts of 
professional misconduct with respect to failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
 
On September 20, 2006, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
 1.   Dr. Vaidyanathan is required to attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be 
fixed by the Hearings Office in conjunction with the parties no later than three months from the 
date this order becomes final. 
 
2.      The Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and 
limitations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s certificate of registration: 
 
(a)    upon his return to practice, Dr. Vaidyanathan is restricted to performing only procedures 
appropriate to an office setting and, in an institutional setting, he is restricted to performing as a 
surgical assistant (meaning that Dr. Vaidyanathan may only assist other surgeons in their cases 
and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case and is precluded from providing surgical care 
including any post-operative care). 
 
(b)   Dr. Vaidyanathan shall practice in an office setting under a clinical supervisor, who is 
acceptable to the College and who has signed an undertaking acceptable to the College, for 
twelve months following the resumption of practice at his own expense.  The clinical supervisor 
will report quarterly to the College.  Dr. Vaidyanathan will be required to meet with the 
supervisor monthly, at which time the supervisor will review a representative sample of Dr. 
Vaidyanathan s patient charts (to be chosen by the supervisor), and discuss them with Dr. 
Vaidyanathan.  Dr. Vaidyanathan is required to follow any recommendations of the clinical 
supervisor.  
 
(c)    In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan wishes to resume the full practice of 
obstetrics/gynecology and have the terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 removed, he 
must undergo a preceptorship acceptable to the College, at his own expense, for a minimum 
period of three months, with an obstetrician/gynecologist who is acceptable to the College, who 
has signed an undertaking acceptable to the College.  At the conclusion of the preceptorship, the 
preceptor must report to the College that Dr. Vaidyanathan is, in all respects, ready to resume the 
independent, operative practice of obstetrics/gynecology.   
 
(d)   If the parties cannot agree upon and consider it appropriate for the Committee to specify 
more specific terms for the preceptorship, the Committee will consider written submissions from 
the parties in this regard to be filed within thirty days of the date of this Order, and will impose 
specific terms relating to the preceptorship. 
 
  
 
  
 
               
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 2005


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Sep 2001
Summary:

On September 8, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vaidyanathan guilty of professional 
misconduct with respect to failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, 
falsifying a medical record, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 
 The Committee also found Dr. Vaidyanathan to be incompetent. 
 
On November 8, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1.    Dr. Vaidyanathan appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and that the 
fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register. 
 
2.    The Registrar suspends Dr. Vaidyanathan s Certificate of Registration for a period of 24 
months, beginning on the date that Dr. Vaidyanathan voluntarily agreed to completely withdraw 
from practice, that being August 10, 2001. 
 
3.    Eighteen months of the 24-month suspension will be suspended if, and only if, Dr. 
Vaidyanathan agrees, within 30 days of the release of this Decision, to comply with all of the 
terms and conditions set out below and to satisfy the terms and conditions on or before the 
18-month period of suspension expires.   
 
(a)   Dr. Vaidyanathan is referred to the Quality Assurance Committee, which Committee will 
be provided with the Notice of Hearing, the Decision of the Discipline Committee, and the report 
of Dr. Roth. The Quality Assurance Committee will appoint a practice supervisor to monitor Dr. 
Vaidyanathan s office and hospital based practice, with emphasis on the practice areas 
enumerated in sub-paragraph 3(b) below. The supervisor will monitor Dr. Vaidyanathan s 
practice for a period of 6 months from the date of his return to practice or for any additional time 
as may be recommended by the Quality Assurance Committee.  The supervisor will report 
his/her observations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s practice, including patient load, to the Quality 
Assurance Committee. The parameters, duration, and frequency of supervision and the 
supervisor s obligation to report to the Quality Assurance Committee will be determined by the 
Quality Assurance Committee.   
 
Dr. Vaidyanathan shall abide by, and implement forthwith, any recommendations made by the 
Quality Assurance Committee. The Quality Assurance Committee may also, at its discretion, 
conduct an independent peer review at any time. 
 
(b)   The Quality Assurance Committee will assess Dr. Vaidyanathan s competence through a 
Specialty Assessment Program ( S.A.P. ).  Such assessment should consider and address the 
concerns raised in Dr. Roth s report, and focus on a general Obstetrics/Gynecology practice, with 
emphasis on the diagnosis and care of the following: premature ruptured membranes; premature 
labor; fetal distress/in-utero death; pregnancy-induced hypertension; and emergency obstetrical 
care and management.  
 
The S.A.P. is to be at Dr. Vaidyanathan s cost, and may occur anytime after May 10th, 2002, but 
must be completed on or before March 10th, 2003. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall abide by, and 
implement forthwith, any recommendations made by the S.A.P. or by the Quality Assurance 
Committee.  Dr. Vaidyanathan must also file proof of his successful completion of the S.A.P., 
and his successful implementation of its recommendations, if any, with the Registrar before July 
10th, 2003. 
 
(c)   Dr. Vaidyanathan will return to work gradually (i.e. he is not to assume his pre 
hearing caseload). Dr. Vaidyanathan must restrict his hospital practice to the hospital where he 
holds an active staff appointment until the end of the suspended portion of this penalty. In the 
event that Dr. Vaidyanathan should move his active staff appointment to a different hospital, he 
must continue to restrict his hospital practice to one active staff appointment only during the 
suspended portion of the penalty. In the event Dr. Vaidyanathan does not hold an active staff 
appointment, he may obtain temporary privileges (locum tenens) provided he only works at no 
more than two  hospitals at any given period of time through until the end of the suspended 
portion of the penalty. 
 
Dr. Vaidyanathan will confirm his compliance with this restriction by providing the Quality 
Assurance Committee with written confirmation of such compliance upon his return to practice 
and every 4 months thereafter. 
 
(d)   Dr. Vaidyanathan will attend (at his cost, if any) and successfully complete courses 
acceptable to the Registrar, on Stress Management  and Time Management . These courses 
must be completed, and Dr. Vaidyanathan must provide the Registrar with evidence of his 
successful completion of the courses on or before July 10, 2003. 
 
Dr. Vaidyanathan will refer himself to a  psychiatrist   acceptable to the registrar within   30 
days from the release of this Decision. Dr. Vaidyanathan must receive psychiatric treatment on a 
regular basis (at the discretion of the treating psychiatrist) for a period of at least six (6) months, 
or for such additional time as Dr. Vaidyanathan s psychiatrist deems necessary.  
 
At his first appointment, Dr. Vaidyanathan shall provide the psychiatrist with a copy of the 
Amended Notice of Hearing, (Exhibit 1), the report of Dr. Roth (Exhibit 3), and a copy of the 
Discipline Committee s Decision and Reasons for Decision in this case.  An undertaking from 
the psychiatrist, in the form attached hereto, shall be obtained and filed with the Registrar, 
acknowledging the psychiatrist s responsibilities.  
 
The psychiatrist shall provide the College with a written report on Dr. Vaidyanathan s condition 
within six (6) months of the first appointment.   The report should address whether further 
treatment is necessary. If treatment is continued, the psychiatrist will continue to report  to the 
College at six (6) month intervals,.  
 
4.    Any costs relating to the implementation of this order, including costs of preparing 
reports, which are not covered by OHIP, shall be paid by Dr. Vaidyanathan within thirty days of 
Dr. Vaidyanathan s receipt of the relevant invoice. 
 
5.    In the event Dr. Vaidyanathan elects not to return to practice after the 6 month period of 
suspension, (i.e. if he elects not to comply with the terms and conditions in paragraph 3 above in 
order to suspend 18 months of the 24 month suspension) then Dr. Vaidyanathan shall 
immediately, and in no event later than Thursday, February 28, 2002, notify the Registrar of his 
decision, whereupon the Registrar shall, and is hereby directed to, impose the terms and 
conditions enumerated in paragraph 3 above as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
Vaidyanathan s certificate of registration. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall comply with those terms, 
conditions and limitations upon his return to practice, and they shall remain on his certificate of 
registration until satisfied. 
 
6.    Dr. Vaidyanathan shall pay to the College costs in the amount of $12,500 within a period 
of eight (8) months following the day that Dr. Vaidyanathan returns to practice or within twelve 
(12) months from the day following the last day of the license suspension, whichever first occurs. 
 
7.    In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan breaches or fails to fulfill any one of the foregoing 
conditions, his certificate of registration shall immediately be suspended until such time as the 
conditions are fulfilled. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 15 Dec 2001
Hearing Date(s): Aug 15, 2001