Vaillancourt, Samuel (CPSO#: 88568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4168645976
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel Vaillancourt Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaillancourt ( CPSO# 88568 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5976

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL VAILLANCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAILLANCOURT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013