Vaillancourt, Yves (CPSO#: 103968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
172 Ethel St
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone: (705) 753-5700
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

725 Coursol Rd
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3110
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

50 College Dr
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaillancourt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Vaillancourt ( CPSO# 103968)

Business Address:
172 Ethel Street
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone Number: (705) 753-5700

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVES VAILLANCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAILLANCOURT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016