Vainberg, Mitchell Gabel (CPSO#: 95622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 960-1366
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITCHELL GABEL VAINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAINBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016