Vairavanathan, Rajani (CPSO#: 78000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7734
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Flemingdon Health Center
10 Gateway Blvd
Don Mills ON  M3C 3A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 429-4991
Fax: (416) 422-3573
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajani Vairavanathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vairavanathan ( CPSO# 78000 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJANI VAIRAVANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAIRAVANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2004