Vaishnav, Vandana (CPSO#: 87965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S0A9
Phone: (647) 973-2025
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vandana Vaishnav Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vaishnav ( CPSO# 87965 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L6J 6T7
Phone Number: (647) 973-2025

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANDANA VAISHNAV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAISHNAV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2008 to 16 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016