Vaithilingam, Dushandhan (CPSO#: 60963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 The West Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5S1
Phone: (416) 626-6383
Fax: (416) 626-6326
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSHANDHAN VAITHILINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAITHILINGAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1991