Vajid, Muhammad Ali (CPSO#: 87442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Sind Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Dept of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3084
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Canada
Phone: (705) 748-0433
Fax: (705) 876-4601
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Vajid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vajid ( CPSO# 87442 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Muhammad  Ali  Vajid  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine.